AZ SB1251 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Armed robbery; deadly weapon; classification
Title
Armed robbery; deadly weapon; classification
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 348 |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-18-2-0) |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-2-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |