AZ SB1250 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Protective orders; sexual assault

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective orders; sexual assault

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateChapter 118
2019-04-22SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-16SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-04-16SenateSenate concurs
2019-04-16SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-11SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2019-04-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2019-04-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-20HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-28HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-21SenateSenate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-29SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
131429New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71854
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1250p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1250s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1250h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0118.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1250farnsworth e. (12).docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1250jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1250allen j.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1250judiciary.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71854&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71854&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71854&billStatusActionId=187364&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71854&billStatusActionId=187459&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71854&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71854&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71854&billStatusActionId=188914&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71854&billStatusActionId=188936&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71854&billStatusActionId=188977&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71854&billStatusActionId=188982&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback