AZ SB1248 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pet store operators; dealers; regulations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pet store operators; dealers; regulations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19 Chapter 351
2016-05-19 Governor Signed
2016-05-04 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-04SenateSenate final reading , voting: (18-9-3-0)
2016-05-04SenateSenate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2016-04-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-04-06HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-04-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (36-23-1-0)
2016-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2016-03-29HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-29HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-28HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0)
2016-03-09HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-17HouseHouse AWL Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-1-0)
2016-03-10HouseReferred to House AWL Committee
2016-03-10HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-09HouseAssigned to House AWL Committee
2016-03-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-03-02SenateTransmit to House
2016-03-02SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (19-8-3-0)
2016-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-03-01SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-01SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment
2016-01-26SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-23SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0)
2016-01-27SenateReferred to Senate APPROP Committee
2016-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2016-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-11SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2016-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=SB1248
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1248p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1248s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1248h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0351.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.1248barton se2.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.1248agriculture water and lands.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1248.sapprop.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1248.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1248.hawl.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1248.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1248.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/sb1248.sfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback