AZ SB1241 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (13-16-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (13-16-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voting equipment; ballots; receipt
Title
Voting equipment; ballots; receipt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-21 - House - Motion Representative Toma moved that pursuant to Rule 12(O) Senate Bill 1241 be referred to an Additional Committee of Whole for the purposes of further amending. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-21 - House - Motion Representative Toma moved that pursuant to Rule 12(O) Senate Bill 1241 be referred to an Additional Committee of Whole for the purposes of further amending. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (13-16-1-0) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-06-21 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ballots
Conduct Of Elections
Driver License Voter Registration (h)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Voting System (h)
Paper Receipt
Receipt
Tabulating Votes (h)
Tabulation (h)
Voting Equipment
Conduct Of Elections
Driver License Voter Registration (h)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Voting System (h)
Paper Receipt
Receipt
Tabulating Votes (h)
Tabulation (h)
Voting Equipment