AZ SB1240 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House TRANS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House TRANS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle storage charges
Title
Vehicle storage charges
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Civil Penalty
Definitions
Release Of Vehicle
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Fees
Vehicle Impoundment
Vehicle Storage Charges
Definitions
Release Of Vehicle
Transportation - Title 28
Vehicle Fees
Vehicle Impoundment
Vehicle Storage Charges