AZ SB1240 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco tax statutes; reorganization
Title
Tobacco tax statutes; reorganization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Chapter 85 | |
2015-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |