AZ SB1237 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Chapter 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Chapter 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fertility fraud; civil; criminal action
Title
Fertility fraud; civil; criminal action
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 126 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Fertility Fraud
Class 6 Felony
Classification
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Action
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definition
Definitions
Fertility Fraud
Government Contracts
Health Care Actions
Human Reproductive Material
Liability
Physicians
Statute Of Limitations
Civil Fertility Fraud
Class 6 Felony
Classification
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Action
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definition
Definitions
Fertility Fraud
Government Contracts
Health Care Actions
Human Reproductive Material
Liability
Physicians
Statute Of Limitations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 567 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2413 | New Code | See Bill Text |