AZ SB1237 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Chapter 150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Governor
Title
Governor
Sponsors
Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Sen. Bob Worsley [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Chapter 150 | |
2016-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-1-5-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |