AZ SB1236 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adult adoption; stepchildren
Title
Adult adoption; stepchildren
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Chapter 74 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-05-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-10-0-0) |
2020-05-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-05-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-05-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-05-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adult Adoption
Agreement
Consent Of Spouse
Court Procedure
Emergency
Petitions
Stepchildren
Trusts, Estates And Protective Proceedings - Title 14
Agreement
Consent Of Spouse
Court Procedure
Emergency
Petitions
Stepchildren
Trusts, Estates And Protective Proceedings - Title 14