AZ SB1221 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vulnerable adults; jurisdiction; grand juries
Title
Vulnerable adults; jurisdiction; grand juries
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Motion Representative Parker moved that pursuant to Rule 12(O), SB1221 be calendared for an Additional Commiittee of the Whole for the purpose of amending. Passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Motion Representative Parker moved that pursuant to Rule 12(O), SB1221 be calendared for an Additional Commiittee of the Whole for the purpose of amending. Passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chapter 206 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-04-01 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-30 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |