AZ SB1221 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

SNAP; benefit match; appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SNAP; benefit match; appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-09HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-03-09HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-03-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-12HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0)
2020-02-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-04SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2020-01-27SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73444
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1221p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1221s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.1221kerr.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1221approp.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73444&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73444&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73444&billStatusActionId=193331&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73444&billStatusActionId=193337&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback