AZ SB1221 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Irrigation grandfathered right; containerized plants.
Title
Irrigation grandfathered right; containerized plants.
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Rep. David Livingston [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2484 (Replaced by) 2019-02-20 - Chapter 7