AZ SB1217 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Arizona high school graduates; tuition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arizona high school graduates; tuition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-15HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-15HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0)
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-04SenateSenate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2019-01-29SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-28SenateAssigned to Senate HEWD Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151809New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71795
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1217p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1217s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1217carter.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1217hewd.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1217carter0939.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71795&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71795&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71795&billStatusActionId=186628&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71795&billStatusActionId=186634&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback