AZ SB1213 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transition program; qualifications
Title
Transition program; qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-19 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-9-1-0) | |
2012-03-12 | House Consent Calendar March 12, 2012 @ 1:43 PM | |
2012-03-13 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-13 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-23 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-02-22 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House read second time | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-09 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-09 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Consent Calendar February 06, 2012 @ 1:17 PM | |
2012-02-07 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-06 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |