AZ SB1196 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Developmental homes; monitoring
Title
Developmental homes; monitoring
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Health Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Health Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2018-04-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0) |
2018-03-28 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-26 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Developmental Disabilities
Developmental Homes
Group Homes
Monitoring
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Strike Everything Amendment
Developmental Homes
Group Homes
Monitoring
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Strike Everything Amendment