AZ SB1192 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Community college tuition financing districts.
Title
Community college tuition financing districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelli Ward [R] | Sen. David Bradley [D] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] |
Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | House GHE Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-5-0-1-0) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-0-1-0) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |