AZ SB1188 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Internal revenue code conformity
Title
Internal revenue code conformity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Chapter 227 | |
2015-04-09 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-04-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0) |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2015-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-4-0-2-0) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-23 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-1-0) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |