AZ SB1179 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Chapter 146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Memorial; buffalo soldiers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorial; buffalo soldiers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateChapter 146
2018-04-05SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-02SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-02HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-08HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-05HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-01HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-01HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-14SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70234
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1179p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1179s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0146.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70234&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70234&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70234&billStatusActionId=181919&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70234&billStatusActionId=182126&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70234&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70234&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70234&billStatusActionId=182834&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback