AZ SB1176 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
340B drug program; prohibitions
Title
340B drug program; prohibitions
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 288 |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (24-2-4-0) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-05-31 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-0-7-0) |
2022-05-31 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-05-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House GE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-2-2-0-0-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
340b Drug Program (h)
Committee (h)
Corporate Income Tax Credits
Income Tax Credit Review
Individual Income Tax Credits
Insurance - Title 20 (h)
Joint Legislative Income Tax Credit Review Committee
Meetings (h)
Pharmacy (h)
Prohibition (h)
Report
Tax Credit Review (h)
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Committee (h)
Corporate Income Tax Credits
Income Tax Credit Review
Individual Income Tax Credits
Insurance - Title 20 (h)
Joint Legislative Income Tax Credit Review Committee
Meetings (h)
Pharmacy (h)
Prohibition (h)
Report
Tax Credit Review (h)
Taxation Of Income - Title 43