AZ SB1174 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Senate miscellaneous motion: Motion to suspend a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 for the purpose of returning Senate Bill 1174 to the calendar of the Committee of the Whole. Motion carried.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Senate miscellaneous motion: Motion to suspend a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 for the purpose of returning Senate Bill 1174 to the calendar of the Committee of the Whole. Motion carried.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; desegregation expenses; special override
Title
Schools; desegregation expenses; special override
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Motion Motion to suspend a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 for the purpose of returning Senate Bill 1174 to the calendar of the Committee of the Whole. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Motion to suspend a portion of Senate Rule 8A-3 for the purpose of returning Senate Bill 1174 to the calendar of the Committee of the Whole. Motion carried. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Desegregation
Desegregation Expenses
Desegregation Funding
Education
Elections
School Finance
Schools
Special Override
Desegregation Expenses
Desegregation Funding
Education
Elections
School Finance
Schools
Special Override
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 483 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |