AZ SB1171 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ASRS; spousal consent
Title
ASRS; spousal consent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | House HEWD Committee action: Withdrawn |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House HEWD Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | House IR Committee action: Withdrawn |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to House IR Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to House HEWD Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Assigned to House IR Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |