AZ SB1170 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
G&F; tags; permits; voter registration
Title
G&F; tags; permits; voter registration
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Senate | Chapter 276 |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (20-9-1-0) |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-05-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-9-9-0) |
2022-05-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-03-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-14 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-7-2-0) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Elections And Electors - Title 16
G&f (see Also: Game And Fish Department)
Game And Fish
Game And Fish - Title 17
Game And Fish Department (g&f)
Hunting, Fishing, And Trapping Licenses
Permits
Repeal
State Government - Title 41 (h)
Tags
Voter Registration
Voter Registration Assistance
G&f (see Also: Game And Fish Department)
Game And Fish
Game And Fish - Title 17
Game And Fish Department (g&f)
Hunting, Fishing, And Trapping Licenses
Permits
Repeal
State Government - Title 41 (h)
Tags
Voter Registration
Voter Registration Assistance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 132 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |