AZ SB1166 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Juvenile court dispositions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile court dispositions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateChapter 240
2021-04-16SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-12SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-08SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-04-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0)
2021-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-24HouseHouse CJR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-18HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-25HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to House CJR Committee
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-02-05HouseTransmit to House
2021-02-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2021-02-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-01SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-02-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-01-28SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2021-01-20SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8249Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8348Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8349Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74767
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1166p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1166s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0240.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481622
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487122
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488123
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488708
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74767&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74767&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74767&billStatusActionId=200190&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74767&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74767&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74767&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74767&billStatusActionId=203617&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback