AZ SB1166 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Service animals; certification; registration; identification
Title
Service animals; certification; registration; identification
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara McGuire [D] | Sen. Catherine Miranda [D] | Rep. Andrea Dalessandro [D] | Sen. Katie Hobbs [D] |
Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Rep. Richard Andrade [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-17 | House | House GHE Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-1-1-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate NR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate NR Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NR Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |