AZ SB1165 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Senate final reading , voting: (15-13-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Senate final reading , voting: (15-13-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
DUI; license suspension
Title
DUI; license suspension
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Senate final reading , voting: (15-13-2-0) | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-28 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-28 | House third reading , voting: (35-24-1-0) | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-29 | House TI Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2010-04-06 | House GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-03-03 | House read second time | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-02-12 | Transmit to House | |
2010-02-11 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Consent Calendar February 01, 2010 @ 2:44 PM | |
2010-02-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-21 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |