AZ SB1164 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Chapter 111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Arizona procurement code; amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arizona procurement code; amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateChapter 111
2017-03-29SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-03-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (38-17-5-0)
2017-03-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-03-07HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-14HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-14SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-02-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-01SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-01-24SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-23SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
412567Amended CodeSee Bill Text
412573Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68927
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1164p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1164s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0111.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68927&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68927&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68927&billStatusActionId=174736&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68927&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68927&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68927&billStatusActionId=176690&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback