AZ SB1161 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment insurance; technical correction
Title
Unemployment insurance; technical correction
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-22 | Senate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-20 | House third reading , voting: (56-1-3-0) | |
2010-04-12 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Senate HEALTH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |