AZ SB1152 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Foster care children; rights
Title
Foster care children; rights
Sponsors
Sen. Amanda Aguirre [D] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Manuel Alvarez [D] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Sen. Leah Landrum-Taylor [D] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Sen. Rebecca Rios [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-03 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-26 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-26 | House third reading , voting: (42-15-3-0) | |
2010-04-15 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-13 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2010-03-09 | House read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-02-12 | Transmit to House | |
2010-02-11 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate Consent Calendar February 01, 2010 @ 2:44 PM | |
2010-02-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |