AZ SB1147 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco products; vapor products
Title
Tobacco products; vapor products
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | House HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Economic Development Activities
Lease
Municipal Economic Development
Municipal Property
Sale
Sale Or Lease Of Municipal Property
Economic Development Activities
Lease
Municipal Economic Development
Municipal Property
Sale
Sale Or Lease Of Municipal Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.08 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 403.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |