AZ SB1147 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

County excise tax for transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County excise tax for transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-07HouseHouse TI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House TI Committee
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-20HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-20SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
426104New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70075
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1147p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1147s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1147worsley1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1147transit.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1147floorworsley2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1147campbell1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1147transportation and infrastructure.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1147payne3.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1147ugenti-rita1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1147payne4.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1147leach1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1147leach2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1147ugenti-rita2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1147ways and means.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70075&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70075&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70075&billStatusActionId=181110&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70075&billStatusActionId=181242&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70075&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70075&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback