AZ SB1145 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax; virtual currency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; virtual currency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-01-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431122Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback