AZ SB1142 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Riot; planning; participation; racketeering

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Riot; planning; participation; racketeering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-22SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2017-02-21SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-02-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-02-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-02SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2017-01-23SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-19SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-01-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
131003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
132301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
132903Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback