AZ SB1130 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Child; vulnerable adult; abuse
Title
Child; vulnerable adult; abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3623 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |