AZ SB1125 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - House ED Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - House ED Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
County school superintendent; qualifications; administrators
Title
County school superintendent; qualifications; administrators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | House ED Committee action: Held |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |