AZ SB1123 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Senate TAT Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Senate TAT Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Towing companies; abandoned vehicles; fee
Title
Towing companies; abandoned vehicles; fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Abandoned Vehicle Administration Monies
Abandoned Vehicles
Deposit
Fee
Fees
Partial Reimbursement
Payment Forfeiture
Registration
Repeal
Towing Companies
Transportation - Title 28
Abandoned Vehicles
Deposit
Fee
Fees
Partial Reimbursement
Payment Forfeiture
Registration
Repeal
Towing Companies
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 4802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4806 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |