AZ SB1121 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certified qualified applicators; fingerprinting requirement
Title
Certified qualified applicators; fingerprinting requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Chapter 173 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (43-15-1-0) |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-09 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Agriculture
Certification
Department Of Public Safety
Fingerprint Requirements
Pest Control And Pesticides
Pest Management
Qualified Applicators
Certification
Department Of Public Safety
Fingerprint Requirements
Pest Control And Pesticides
Pest Management
Qualified Applicators