AZ SB1118 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Chapter 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of tourism; continuation
Title
Office of tourism; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | Chapter 108 | |
2016-05-06 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-04 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0) |
2016-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-1-0) |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |