AZ SB1117 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Housing; infrastructure; regulation; administration
Title
Housing; infrastructure; regulation; administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 9 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (9-20-1-0) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Administration
Aggregate Mining
Amendment
Amendment Procedure
Amendments To Plat
Annual Report
Applicability
Authority
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Compliance
Consequence
Counties - Title 11
Definition
Definitions
Design Standards
Employees
Enforcement
Exemptions
Extension Of Corporate Limits
Failure To Comply
Housing
Infrastructure
Licensing
Map
Municipal Housing Needs Assessment
Municipal Platting
Municipalities
Notice
Plat
Preemption
Prohibited Acts
Prohibition
Public Hearing
Regulation
Regulatory Bill Of Rights
Required
Residential Housing
Residential Zoning Districts
Restriction On Regulation
Strike Everything Amendment
Technical Correction
Time Frame
Zoning Regulations
Aggregate Mining
Amendment
Amendment Procedure
Amendments To Plat
Annual Report
Applicability
Authority
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Compliance
Consequence
Counties - Title 11
Definition
Definitions
Design Standards
Employees
Enforcement
Exemptions
Extension Of Corporate Limits
Failure To Comply
Housing
Infrastructure
Licensing
Map
Municipal Housing Needs Assessment
Municipal Platting
Municipalities
Notice
Plat
Preemption
Prohibited Acts
Prohibition
Public Hearing
Regulation
Regulatory Bill Of Rights
Required
Residential Housing
Residential Zoning Districts
Restriction On Regulation
Strike Everything Amendment
Technical Correction
Time Frame
Zoning Regulations