AZ SB1112 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance; surplus lines; exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; surplus lines; exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateChapter 158
2018-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-1-4-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-01-29HouseTransmit to House
2018-01-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-01-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-22SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-01-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-17SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20420Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69924
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1112p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1112s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0158.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69924&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69924&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69924&billStatusActionId=179749&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69924&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69924&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69924&billStatusActionId=182893&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback