AZ SB1108 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Mar 29 @ 9:00 am in HHR 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Mar 29 @ 9:00 am in HHR 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; credit; labor costs
Title
Income tax; credit; labor costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Allocation
Credit
Credit For Increased Hourly Labor Costs
Definitions
Distribution
Income Tax
Labor Costs
Purpose
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Urban Revenue Sharing
Withholding
Credit
Credit For Increased Hourly Labor Costs
Definitions
Distribution
Income Tax
Labor Costs
Purpose
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Urban Revenue Sharing
Withholding
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 1079 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1166 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |