AZ SB1106 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Social media platforms; standards; notification
Title
Social media platforms; standards; notification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-05-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-1-0) |
2023-04-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Candidates
Cause Of Action
Censorship
Censorship Standards (h)
Civil Penalties
Definition
Deplatforming Prohibited
Exceptions
Free Advertising
Highways And Bridges - Title 18 (h)
Information Technology - Title 18
Notification
Penalties (h)
Remedies
Social Media
Social Media Platforms
Standards
Cause Of Action
Censorship
Censorship Standards (h)
Civil Penalties
Definition
Deplatforming Prohibited
Exceptions
Free Advertising
Highways And Bridges - Title 18 (h)
Information Technology - Title 18
Notification
Penalties (h)
Remedies
Social Media
Social Media Platforms
Standards