AZ SB1102 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hearing aid dispensers; audiologists
Title
Hearing aid dispensers; audiologists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-03-20 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2013-03-11 | House | House Consent Calendar March 11, 2013 @ 3:00 PM |
2013-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |