AZ SB1099 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Liability threshold; estimated TPT payments
Title
Liability threshold; estimated TPT payments
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Sean Bowie [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |