AZ SB1096 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 64
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental appropriations; AHCCCS administration
Title
Supplemental appropriations; AHCCCS administration
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Representative Butler to include the Butler flr amendment to SB1096 (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Representative Butler to include the Butler flr amendment to SB1096 (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 64 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-26-0-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | House motion to amend |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-3-0-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Administration (h)
Ahcccs (h)
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (h)
Commercial Driver License
Driver Licenses
Emergency
Emergency Clause
Supplemental Appropriation (h)
Third Party Driver License Provider
Transportation - Title 28
Ahcccs (h)
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (h)
Commercial Driver License
Driver Licenses
Emergency
Emergency Clause
Supplemental Appropriation (h)
Third Party Driver License Provider
Transportation - Title 28