AZ SB1092 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Claim; notice; public entity; exception

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Claim; notice; public entity; exception

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-08SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12821.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback