AZ SB1091 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax payments; bitcoin

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax payments; bitcoin

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16 Governor Vetoed
2018-05-04 Transmitted to Governor
2018-05-03HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (54-6-0-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (26-2-2-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate Conference adopted
2018-05-03HouseHouse Conference adopted
2018-05-03SenateSenate Conference caucus date
2018-05-02HouseHouse Conference caucus date
2018-05-02SenateSenate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
2018-05-02SenateSenate Conference members: PETERSEN, FARLEY, GRAY
2018-05-02SenateSenate Conference appointed
2018-05-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-05-02SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-05-01HouseHouse Conference members: WENINGER, EPSTEIN, TOMA
2018-05-01HouseHouse Conference appointed
2018-04-30SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-30HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (43-14-3-0)
2018-04-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-07HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-08HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
2018-02-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-24SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-01-11SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-10SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43505Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69854
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1091p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1091s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1091h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1091c.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.10910113.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1091fin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1091bolding.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1091weninger.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1091ways and means.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69854&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69854&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69854&billStatusActionId=180513&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69854&billStatusActionId=180545&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69854&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69854&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69854&billStatusActionId=183416&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69854&billStatusActionId=183421&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69854&billStatusActionId=183732&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69854&billStatusActionId=183750&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback