AZ SB1086 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
DHS; long-term care facility surveyors
Title
DHS; long-term care facility surveyors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefile |