AZ SB1086 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; chiropractic services
Title
AHCCCS; chiropractic services
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. David Bradley [D] | Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Sen. Katie Hobbs [D] |
Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Catherine Miranda [D] | Sen. Lisa Otondo [D] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-1-0) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ahcccs
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Chiropractic Services
Covered Health And Medical Services
Eligibility
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Service Requirements
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Chiropractic Services
Covered Health And Medical Services
Eligibility
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Service Requirements