AZ SB1086 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco products; prohibitions
Title
Tobacco products; prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (29-1-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | House third reading , voting: (54-3-3-0) | |
2011-04-14 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-06 | House Consent Calendar April 06, 2011 @ 4:45 PM with Objections | |
2011-04-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-24 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-02 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-10 | Senate third reading , voting: (13-16-1-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate CE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-11 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |