AZ SB1085 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Chapter 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Chapter 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; funded ratio; asset transfers
Title
PSPRS; funded ratio; asset transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Chapter 221 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-05-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2022-04-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-04-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-04-11 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-01-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Asset Transfers
Funded Ratio
Psprs (see Also: Public Safety Personnel Retirement System)
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System (psprs)
Funded Ratio
Psprs (see Also: Public Safety Personnel Retirement System)
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System (psprs)